Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland New Start Grant Program in the Department of Labor to provide loans to covered individuals participating in eligible entrepreneurship development programs; establishing the Maryland New Start Microloan Program in the Department of Commerce to provide loans to certain individuals participating in those programs; establishing the Maryland New Start Microloan Program Fund for issuing loans under the Program and paying administrative costs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0554
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/07/2021
Legislative Date
10/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-24)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {153429/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (105-24) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263928/1 Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Text - Chapter - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Age
(   5-1901 through 5-1906 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page