Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cancer Drugs – Physician Dispensing and Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law do not prohibit a physician who has a valid dispensing permit and complies with certain provisions of law from personally dispensing to a patient by mail order a starter dosage or a cancer drug or device or an initial or refill prescription of a cancer drug; requiring certain entities to allow certain insureds, enrollees, and beneficiaries to obtain a cancer drug from a dispensing physician; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0513
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2020
Legislative Date
10/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cancer Drugs – Physician Dispensing and Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2020 10/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Cancer Drugs – Physician Dispensing and Coverage
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 10:14 PM
Click to return on the top page