Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax – Combined Reporting and Subtraction Modification for Combined Groups of Corporations
Sponsored by
Delegate Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring affiliated corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a certain combined reporting method; authorizing certain corporations, subject to regulations adopted by the Comptroller, to determine certain income using the water's edge method; requiring, subject to regulations adopted by the Comptroller, certain groups of corporations to file a combined income tax return reflecting the aggregate income tax liability of all the members of the group; requiring the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/17/2020
Legislative Date
9/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/17/2020 9/17/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax – Combined Reporting and Subtraction Modification for Combined Groups of Corporations
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
(   10-311, 10-402.1, 10-811 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page