Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from six to seven the number of video lottery operation licenses and from 16,500 to 19,000 the number of video lottery terminals that may be awarded by the Video Lottery Facility Location Commission to provide for the award of a license at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport under specified circumstances; authorizing up to 2,500 video lottery terminals at the airport; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0371 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   9-1A-05, 9-1A-27, 9-1A-36 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page