Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers from the State Department of Education to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission to provide staff support for the Council; authorizing the Commission to seek the assistance of organizations with expertise in school-based health care or specified other matters to provide additional staffing resources to the Commission and the Council; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text - Chapter - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
(   7-4A-01 through 7-4A-05 )
(   19-22A-01, 19-22A-01 through 19-22A-05, 19-22A-02, 19-22A-03, 19-22A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page