Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Queen Anne's County to hunt any game bird or game mammal on a Sunday during the open season for that game bird or game mammal.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0605
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-6)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (124-6) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page