Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Revocation Prohibited - Citation
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Gutierrez, Morales, Rosenberg, Sanchez, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Division of Parole and Probation from issuing a warrant for the retaking or arrest of a specified offender or probationer or sending a notice of violation to the court for the sole reason that the offender or probationer received a citation for the commission of a nonjailable civil offense; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0615 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page