Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsored by
Delegate W. Fisher
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain circumstances under which an individual who has been convicted of a crime is not qualified for jury service; and repealing a provision specifying that an individual is not qualified for jury service if the individual has a certain charge pending for a certain crime.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0625
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {263020/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (55-84)
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (82-53)
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (48-91) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 21AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Floor Amendment {263020/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (55-84) 21AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed 21AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (82-53) 22AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {408672/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:22 PM
Click to return on the top page