Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Rogers, Bagnall, Clark, Crosby, Hill, Jackson, Korman, Lehman, and R. Lewis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2024, a person from using, manufacturing, or knowingly selling or distributing Class B fire-fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2024, a person from manufacturing, selling, or distributing a certain rug or carpet in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2024, a manufacturer or distributor from manufacturing, selling, or distributing certain food packaging intended for direct food contact in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0273
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {553920/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {403124/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433022/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {553920/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Text - Chapter - Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page