Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Delaying the effective date to January 1, 2025, of certain provisions of law that repeal the authority of paramedics to administer influenza and 2019CoV immunizations under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-22)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {953626/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (108-22) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text - Chapter - Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page