Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Sponsored by
Delegate Williams
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $5,000 to $25,000, the maximum estimated cost in labor and materials for the alteration of a certain existing building or structure for which a person is not required to employ a licensed architect under certain circumstances; and altering the circumstances under which a person is not required to employ a licensed architect.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0093
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text - Chapter - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Last Updated: 9/14/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page