Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Busch, Walker, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Knotts, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that in specified fiscal years specified amounts be provided as an operating grant to the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to be used to support the transition of the Prince George's County Regional Medical Center to a participating institution of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation; requiring that State and Prince George's County funds be used to increase access to critical health care services, to improve the quality of the services provided, and to facilitate cost containment; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0324
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - transfer of governance of PG Co Regional Medical Center to UMMS
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194964/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Gaines) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {643223/1 Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-46)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {194964/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Gaines) Adopted 40
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {643223/1 Rejected (49-87) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-46) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page