Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, D.M. Davis, Feldmark, R. Lewis, Lierman, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody to provide notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian in a manner reasonably calculated to give actual notice; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and an effort to provide certain notice to the child's parent, guardian, or custodian has been made; requiring an interrogation of a child to be recorded under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0136
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {372913/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-41)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {372913/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (90-41) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page