Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Institutions of Higher Education - Police Departments - Repeal and Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law relating to the establishment and maintenance of a Johns Hopkins University police department, including all applicable authorizations, powers, requirements, and prohibitions on the University, University police officers, the Baltimore Police Department, and the Department of Legislative Services; prohibiting a private institution of higher education from establishing a police department or granting employees the powers of a peace or police officer; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2020
Legislative Date
10/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2020 10/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Private Institutions of Higher Education - Police Departments - Repeal and Prohibition
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page