Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified limitations, and specified exceptions to specified limitations, on the retention proceeds under the terms of specified construction contracts or of any payment due to a contractor or a subcontractor under the terms of specified construction contracts; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page