Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Adams, Arentz, Clark, Ghrist, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Mautz, and Otto
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the Department of Natural Resources may plant or allow to be planted only certain native oyster shell, including fossilized native oyster shell, of the species Crassostrea virginica for use as substrate for an oyster restoration, propagation, or replenishment project; and authorizing the Department to use certain alternate materials as substrate for a project if certain entities recommend or approve the use and after the Department prepares a certain analysis for and holds a public hearing on the project.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0362
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM
Click to return on the top page