Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Aumann, Barkley, Bromwell, Brooks, Clippinger, Glenn, Lierman, and Lisanti
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a limited liability company to have a company representative; requiring the articles of organization, articles of cancellation, and articles of reinstatement of a limited liability company to include the name and street address of the company representative; applying to a company representative specified provisions of law relating to a change of a resident agent, a change of address of a resident agent, or a resignation of a resident agent of a limited liability company; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   4A-1002, 4A-101, 4A-204, 4A-210, 4A-909, 4A-916 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page