Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to borrow not more than $30,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in St. Mary's County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page