Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Charkoudian
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment to 30 times the State minimum hourly wage in effect at the time the wages are due, multiplied by the number of weeks during which the wages due were earned; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683497/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {683497/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183
Text - Chapter - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
(   15-601.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page