Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Grammer, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility criteria under the cybersecurity investment incentive tax credit to provide the credit to a specified qualified investor in a specified qualified Maryland cybersecurity company rather than providing the credit to the company; and extending the termination date of the credit from June 30, 2019, to June 30, 2023.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0318
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page