Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Removing Montgomery County from the scope of law governing the establishment of business improvement districts; authorizing Montgomery County or a municipal corporation in Montgomery County to create specified business improvement districts; providing for the legislative purposes of a district; requiring the county or a municipal corporation in the county to adopt specified local laws to provide for the creation and organization of a district; providing for the governance of the business improvement district corporation; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {850411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {850411/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
(   12-402.1, 12-601 through 12-612 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page