Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Korman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain whistleblower protections for certain employees of the State apply to the employees of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority contingent on certain action by the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia; specifying certain whistleblower protection laws that the General Assembly considers similar for the purpose of a certain provision of law; establishing the intent of the General Assembly to waive the sovereign immunity of the State for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {974161/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 193
Text - Chapter - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
(   10-204, 10-209 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page