Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program - Expansion and Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified farms", for purposes of a certain credit against the State income tax for certain food donations, to include farm businesses located in the State rather than in certain counties; extending the taxable years for which a qualified farm may claim the credit to 2021; reducing the maximum amount of tax certificates to be issued in a fiscal year, from $250,000 to $100,000; providing that a tax credit certificate may not be issued by the Department of Agriculture after December 31, 2021; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355963/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {949933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Reilly and Mosby)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Reilly and Mosby)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {313622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {313622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program - Expansion and Extension
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments {355963/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program - Expansion and Extension
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {949933/1 Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Reilly and Mosby) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Reilly and Mosby) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {313622/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {313622/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program - Expansion and Extension
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program - Expansion and Extension
(   10-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page