Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Court Administrator to ensure that each judge in the State receive tests, training, and evaluation for implicit bias; and requiring the Administrator to ensure that data on the tests, training, and evaluation required by the Act is made available to the public on a website or by request.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judges - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Judges - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:36 PM
Click to return on the top page