Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Motion Special Order vote on veto until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering references to the term "clean energy" to be "advanced clean energy" for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the Maryland Clean Energy Center and the Maryland Energy Innovation Institute; altering certain findings of the General Assembly, the purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the development of clean energy industries in the State, and the purposes, powers, and duties of the Center and Institute to include certain actions supporting clean energy innovation; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0460
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/19/2020
Legislative Date
8/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-39)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/19/2020 8/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-39) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {247878/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
(   10-401, 10-402, 10-801, 10-802, 10-806, 10-807, 10-820, 10-821.1, 10-823, 10-826, 10-828, 10-829, 10-830, 10-834, 10-835, 10-839, 9-101 )
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 12/7/2021 12:04 PM
Click to return on the top page