Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Participation in Healthy Lifestyle Programs - Incentives and Tax Credits
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the authorized uses of the HealthChoice Performance Incentive Fund to include financial incentives designed to promote participation in a healthy lifestyle program by Maryland Medical Assistance Program managed care organization enrollees; authorizing an individual who meets specified requirements to claim a credit against the State income tax for participation in a healthy lifestyle program; establishing a credit of $500 for specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Health - Participation in Healthy Lifestyle Programs - Incentives and Tax Credits
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-103.3 )
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page