Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain designations on a marriage license and certificate; and authorizing the clerk of the circuit court to maintain a certain electronic record as an alternative to the requirement that the clerk keep a certain marriage license book.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0488
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {243523/1 (Delegate Parrott) Withdrawn
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {213225/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-93)
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-27)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {243523/1 (Delegate Parrott) Withdrawn 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {213225/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-93) 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 17BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (98-27) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 1:14 PM
Click to return on the top page