Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified farm a credit, for tax years 2017 through 2019, of up to $5,000 against the State income tax; providing that the credit is equal to 50% of the value of an eligible food donation or 75% of the value of donated certified organic produce; providing that the amount of tax credit certificates may not exceed $250,000 per year; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture, in consultation with the Comptroller, to report to the Governor and General Assembly on specified matters by January 1 of specified years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-19)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-19) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page