Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified persons who are required to provide specified notice or make reports of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to give the notice or make the reports; establishing a misdemeanor and penalties of a fine not to exceed $1,000 or imprisonment up to 1 year, or both, for knowingly failing to report child abuse or neglect; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0140 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-602.2 )
(   5-704, 5-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page