Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 466
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a health care facility from providing peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis treatment services unless the individual performing the dialysis procedure has been trained in the peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis technique being performed; establishing civil penalties not exceeding $5,000 for each violation of the Act; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0111
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 466
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {593926/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Finance 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 466
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
(   19-114,   20-2001, 20-2002 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page