Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before April 1, 2022, to develop and publish materials to assist State residents with long-term care family planning; requiring certain materials to meet certain requirements; requiring the Department to make certain materials available in certain languages; requiring the Department to ensure that certain materials are understandable to individuals with limited literacy skills; requiring certain State agencies to update certain websites in a certain manner on or before April 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Finance 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {677372/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page