Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Explanation of Benefits Statements
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring pharmacy benefits managers to provide to beneficiaries for whom the pharmacy benefits manager processed or paid a claim for prescription drugs during the immediately preceding 3-month period an explanation of benefits statement on a form approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner and on a quarterly basis; requiring that the explanation of benefits statements contain certain information regarding certain claims for prescription drugs; and applying the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Explanation of Benefits Statements
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-1601,   15-1604.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page