Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Proctor and R. Jones
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate $900,000 to the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland from the Cigarette Restitution Fund in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; and requiring the funds appropriated under the Act to be used for the purpose of funding the activities of the Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0378
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {603328/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page