Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an election of a county commissioner or members of certain county boards of education to represent a specific district to be decided by a plurality of the votes cast within that district; and applying certain provisions of the Act only to code counties and commission counties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government – County Commissioner Elections – District Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {223724/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {433226/1 (Delegate Morgan) Withdrawn
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {603420/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (45-93)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (42-87)
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {783724/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {653524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (39-87)
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {593626/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-86)
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {903624/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (41-86)
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {453627/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Local Government – County Commissioner Elections – District Voting
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {795968/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Floor Amendment {223724/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Floor Amendment {433226/1 (Delegate Morgan) Withdrawn 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Floor Amendment {603420/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (45-93) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Floor Amendment {773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (42-87) 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {783724/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {653524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (39-87) 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {593626/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-86) 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {903624/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (41-86) 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {453627/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-91) 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-10A-01, 3-1101, 3-114, 3-301, 3-4A-01, 3-601, 3-901 )
(   27-1A. )
(   26-1A., 26-1B., 26-1C. )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page