Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified coverage and reimbursement requirements for health care services delivered through telemedicine under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide coverage of and reimbursement for specified health care services that are delivered through telehealth; deeming a health care service provided through telehealth to be equivalent to a specified health care service for a specified purpose; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0570
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Requirements
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page