Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct a full survey within 3 months after the date of transfer of a licensed nursing home, and an unannounced, on-site follow-up survey within 120 days after the full survey was completed, if the ownership of the nursing home is transferred to a person that does not own or operate another nursing home in the State at the time of the transfer.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Site Visits and Surveys
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {696488/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Site Visits and Surveys
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {696488/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Finance 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text - Chapter - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:43 PM
Click to return on the top page