Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring or authorizing, under certain circumstances, the Maryland Stadium Authority to contract for, manage, and oversee certain public school facility projects; authorizing the Prince George's County government and Board of Education to enter into a certain public-private partnership to enhance the delivery of public school construction projects in the county; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 11 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Building Opportunity Act of 2021
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-601, 10-608, 10-618, 10-620, 10-628, 10-634, 10-645, 10-649, 10-650, 10-656, 10-657, 10-658, 10-658.1 )
(   21-207, 4-126, 4-126.1, 4-126.2, 5-206, 5-303, 5-310, 5-313, 5-317, 5-322, 5-324, 5-325, 5-326 )
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page