Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Gabapentin - Monitoring by Prescription Drug Monitoring Program and Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to monitor the prescribing and dispensing of Gabapentin by all prescribers and dispensers in the State; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to submit a report on whether Gabapentin should be added to the a controlled dangerous substances schedule to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 31, 2019.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Gabapentin - Monitoring by Prescription Drug Monitoring Program and Report
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   21-2A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page