Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Buckel, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Pena-Melnyk, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, Pendergrass, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Cullison, Johnson, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except for certain specialty drugs, a pharmacy benefits manager from requiring that a beneficiary use a specific pharmacy or entity to fill a prescription if the pharmacy benefits manager or a corporate affiliate has an ownership interest in the pharmacy or entity or if the pharmacy or entity has an ownership interest in the pharmacy benefits manager or a corporate affiliate.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1402 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496080/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {496080/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text - Chapter - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
(   15-1611.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page