Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property Tax
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the annual deadline from June 30 to October 30 by which a license holder must present the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City a certain certificate regarding certain property taxes.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0401
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property Tax
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property Tax
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property Tax
(   12-102, 12-2103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page