Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Individual Exchange - Copper Plans to Lower Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Szeliga, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, M. Fisher, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Rose, and Saab
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, contingent on the approval of a waiver application under a certain provision of federal law, to make copper plans available in the Individual Exchange to certain individuals; requiring the Exchange to certify a certain health benefit plan as a copper plan if the plan provides certain coverage; requiring the Exchange, on or before October 1, 2019, to apply to certain officials for a certain waiver in order to implement the provision of copper plans in the State; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Individual Exchange - Copper Plans to Lower Rates
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-1303, 31-101, 31-108, 31-113.1, 31-115, 31-115.1, 31-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page