Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Afzali, Ali, C. Howard, Long, Reilly, Rose, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for and increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified qualifying police auxiliaries and reserve volunteers for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {435467/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page