Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein and Barve
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish building emissions standards for certain commercial and residential buildings; establishing the Building Energy Transition Implementation Task Force to study certain matters and develop a plan for funding the retrofit of certain buildings; and requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to update the Maryland Building Performance Standards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-1601 through 2-1603 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page