Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, McKay, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board; establishing the Senator George C. Edwards Fund to provide grant or loan funding to capital infrastructure and business development projects that improve the economic conditions in the region; requiring the Board to develop criteria to review, evaluate, and rate certain proposals for funding, to distribute certain funding, and to monitor and track the progress of certain projects that have received funding; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0474
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1144 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {953122/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund - Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783925/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {953122/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page