Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from being arrested or incarcerated for failure to respond to certain orders to appear in court relating to an examination in aid of enforcement of a money judgment entered in a small claim action in the District Court; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0657
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0597 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-41)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-41) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page