Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the eligible uses of the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to include the provision of certain grants and the conversion of certain loan amounts into grants in areas declared to be federal disaster areas or subject to a federal or State declaration of emergency; limiting to $50,000 the amount of certain grants and loan amounts converted to grants that may be provided to a single business; and limiting to $10,000,000 the aggregate total of certain financial assistance that may be provided in a fiscal year.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {945065/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {217677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {945065/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Finance 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {217677/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text - Chapter - Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page