Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Radiographers, Radiation Therapists, and Nuclear Medicine Technologists - Requirements for Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegate Pendergrass
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified applicants for licensure as radiographers, radiation therapists, and nuclear medicine technologists graduate from specified education programs accredited by specified national accrediting bodies and hold specified licensure, submit verification of specified employment, and have not been subject to or have pending specified disciplinary action under specified circumstances; etc
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page