Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program by extending the duration of the Program, increasing the total amount of rebates issued under the Program, repealing the authority to issue rebates to retail service station dealers, limiting the issuance of rebates to one recharging system per individual per address, and authorizing the Maryland Energy Administration to offer additional benefits under certain circumstances; establishing the Medium- and Heavy-Duty Zero Emission Vehicle Grant Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page