Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a trustee to send certain interested parties in a certain manner a certain report when the trust terminates or on the resignation or removal of the trustee in accordance with the terms of the trust or certain provisions of law; and providing that, if an interested party does not submit an objection to the report within 120 days after the trustee mailed the report, the interested party shall be deemed to have released the trustee and to have consented to and ratified the actions of the trustee; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {832216/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {832216/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Text - Chapter - Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
(   14.5-904, 14.5-907 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page