Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019; and altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page